Global patent index - EP 0790343 A3

EP 0790343 A3 2000-10-18 - Apparatus for needling a nonwoven

Title (en)

Apparatus for needling a nonwoven

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Nadeln eines Vlieses

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'aigguilletage d'un non tissé

Publication

EP 0790343 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97890027 A

Priority

AT 29796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790343A2] An installation for needling a nonwoven has at least one needle beam (1) for accommodating a needle board (2), a rocker arm (12) for guiding the beam (1), and a crank drive (6) for driving the beam (1). The drive (6) features two parallel crank or eccenter shafts (7, 8) which are driven countercurrently and whose push rods are joined to each other by means of a coupling (10) connected flexibly to the rocker arm (12). The rotating axis (13) of the rocker arm (12) can be shifted synchronously with the crank drive (6) via a crank or eccenter shaft (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/00 (2012.01); D04H 18/02 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790343 A2 19970820; EP 0790343 A3 20001018; EP 0790343 B1 20080319; EP 0790343 B8 20080528; AT 403298 B 19971229; AT A29796 A 19970515; DE 59712927 D1 20080430

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59712927

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-04-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON NEUMAG AUSTRIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT