Global Patent Index - EP 0790387 B1

EP 0790387 B1 2000-07-12 - Rock drill bit and method of manufacturing same

Title (en)

Rock drill bit and method of manufacturing same

Title (de)

Gesteinsbohrer sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Trépan de roche et méthode pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0790387 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100123 A

Priority

DE 19601356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790387A1] The hard metal bit (10) has a head (14) with a cutting edge (12) and a foot piece (16) which matches the geometry of a receiver slot (36) in the tool. The distance between the side faces (18,20) of the foot piece in at least one section (24) of the foot piece is greater than the edge area of the side faces of the foot piece. To manufacture the masonry drill, the receiver slot and the foot piece are brought together and the drill bit inserted into the slot. One of the side walls of the slot on the front face (37) of the drill head is blocked off to prevent the bit from falling out. The hard metal bit is then brazed in position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19601356 A1 19970717; AT 194685 T 20000715; DK 0790387 T3 20001030; EP 0790387 A1 19970820; EP 0790387 B1 20000712; ES 2151194 T3 20001216; GR 3034567 T3 20010131; PT 790387 E 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701985

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701985

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130107

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194685 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BERNER TRADING HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 194685 T

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130305

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20121011

2012-11-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BERNER TRADING HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121011

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100108

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110108

2012-04-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BERNER TRADING HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BERNER GMBH, 74653 KUENZELSAU, DE

- Document: DE 59701985

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701985

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701985

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2012-02-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701985

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-09-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PLICA WERKZEUGFABRIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-07-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-08-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-10 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151194 T3

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701985 20000817

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194685 T 20000715

1999-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980212

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE