Global Patent Index - EP 0790634 B1

EP 0790634 B1 2000-02-02 - Electrostatic-magnetic lens arrangement

Title (en)

Electrostatic-magnetic lens arrangement

Title (de)

Elektrostatisch-magnetische Linsenanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de lentille électrostatique-magnétique

Publication

EP 0790634 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110765 A

Priority

DE 19605855 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790634A1] The invention relates to an electrostatic-magnetic lens arrangement for focusing charged particles as well as a charged particle beam device with such a lens arrangement which has a magnetic lens and an electrostatic lens incorporated into the magnetic lens, the magnetic lens being constructed as a single-pole lens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/145 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/145 (2013.01); H01J 2237/2594 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790634 A1 19970820; EP 0790634 B1 20000202; DE 19605855 A1 19970821

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-06-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-06-14 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060405

2005-09-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CARL ZEISS NTS GMBH

2005-02-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CARL ZEISS NTS GMBH

- Effective date: 20001102

2004-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ADVANTEST CORPORATION

2004-03-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ADVANTEST CORPORATION

2002-11-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-09-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ADVANTEST CORPORATION

2002-07-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LEO ELEKTRONENMIKROSKOPIE

2000-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LEO ELEKTRONENMIKROSKOPIE

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606515 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990115

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971006

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL