Global Patent Index - EP 0790719 A3

EP 0790719 A3 2001-05-09 - Method and receiver for the reception and reproduction of digitally coded traffic messages

Title (en)

Method and receiver for the reception and reproduction of digitally coded traffic messages

Title (de)

Verfahren und Empfänger zum Empfang und zur Wiedergabe von digital codierten Verkehrsmeldungen

Title (fr)

Méthode et récepteur pour la réception et reproduction de messages routières codés numériques

Publication

EP 0790719 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96117906 A

Priority

DE 19606009 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790719A2] The method employs a receiver with a tuner (2), radio data system (RDS) decoder (9) and processor (10), memory (8) and output unit (7). Audio broadcasts or stored messages are selected (4) for amplification (5) and reproduction (6) by a traffic radio decoder (11) which responds to a call-sign transmitted as 125 kHz modulation on a 57 kHz carrier wave. The call-sign is transmitted in the digital RDS signal by setting of the TA and TP bits to 1. Reproduction of received signals is inhibited until both the received traffic announcement and the reproduction of the previously stored traffic message are completed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08B 5/22; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/26 (2008.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2013.01); G08G 1/093 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DY] US 4862513 A 19890829 - BRAGAS PETER [DE]
  • [A] DE 4029583 A1 19911114 - HUBER FRANZ F DIPL ING FH [DE]
  • [Y] KOPITZ D: "DEVELOPMENT OF THE TRAFFIC MESSAGE CHANNEL IN RDS", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL,BE,EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, no. 245, 1 February 1991 (1991-02-01), pages 29 - 32, XP000204754, ISSN: 0251-0936

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790719 A2 19970820; EP 0790719 A3 20010509; EP 0790719 B1 20070214; DE 19606009 A1 19970821; DE 59611416 D1 20070329

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59611416

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-10-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-09-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611416 P 20070329

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04H 1/00 A, 7G 08B 5/22 B, 7G 08G 1/09 B

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL