Global Patent Index - EP 0790787 B1

EP 0790787 B1 2000-09-13 - PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR AND PROTECTIVE ARMOUR AND A METHOD OF MODIFYING PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR AND PROTECTIVE ARMOUR

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR AND PROTECTIVE ARMOUR AND A METHOD OF MODIFYING PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR AND PROTECTIVE ARMOUR

Title (de)

SCHÜTZENDE KOPFBEDECKUNG UND SCHUTZSCHILD SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM MODIFIZIEREN VON SCHÜTZENDEN KOPFBEDECKUNGEN UND SCHUTZSCHILDEN

Title (fr)

CASQUE DE PROTECTION, PLASTRON DE PROTECTION, ET PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DU CASQUE DE PROTECTION ET DU PLASTRON DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 0790787 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95937933 A

Priority

  • GB 9502693 W
  • GB 9423113 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9614768A1] With reference to Figure 6, the present invention provides protective headgear comprising: a shell (31) having an inwardly facing surface which in use faces the head of a user of the headgear and an outwardly facing surface which in use faces away from the head of the user; and an outer membrane (30) which overlies at least a portion of the outwardly facing surface of the shell (31) and which is more flexible than the shell (31). The headgear is constructed in such a way that when a force is applied to an outer surface of the headgear which acts to rotate the headgear and the head of the user, the force can cause the outer membrane (30) to move relative to the shell. With reference to Figure 9, the present invention also provides protective armour comprising: a first layer (102) of a first flexibility having a first surface (102A) which in use is presented to receive impact blows; and a membrane (103) which overlies at least a portion of the first surface (102A) of the first layer (102) and which is more flexible than the first layer (102) of material. The protective armour is constructed in such a way that when a force is applied to an outwardly facing surface of the protective armour which has a component tangential to the surface, the force can cause the membrane (103) to move relative to the first layer (102) of material. The present invention further provides methods of modifying existing protective headgear or armour to headgear or armour according to the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/06; A42B 3/04; A42B 3/08; A42B 3/12; A42B 3/28; A63B 71/08; F41H 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/06 (2006.01); A42B 3/08 (2006.01); A42B 3/12 (2006.01); A63B 71/08 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/064 (2013.01); A42B 3/12 (2013.01); A63B 71/081 (2013.01); F41H 5/0478 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9614768 A1 19960523; AU 3875695 A 19960606; DE 69518853 D1 20001019; DE 69518853 T2 20010322; DK 0790787 T3 20010430; EP 0790787 A1 19970827; EP 0790787 B1 20000913; GB 9423113 D0 19950104

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131116

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131116

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69518853

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131116

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130610

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121117

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-06-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PHILLIPS HELMETS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518853

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILLIPS HELMETS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PHILLIPS, KENNETH DAVID, DR.

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980806

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970612

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE