Global Patent Index - EP 0790847 A4

EP 0790847 A4 2000-02-23 - VIBRATION DAMPING

Title (en)

VIBRATION DAMPING

Title (de)

SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNG

Title (fr)

ATTENUATION DES VIBRATIONS

Publication

EP 0790847 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95901796 A

Priority

  • CA 2204762 A
  • US 9412784 W
  • US 6299793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9614108A1] This invention consists of small, effective, lightweight, vibration damping devices (20) for implements which are subject to impact. These devices have a head (30) and a stem (32) and are fabricated from a soft elastomeric material. The stem is capable of oscillating over a 360 degree span in directions generally normal to the longitudinal axis of the device. The peripheral part of the head can oscillate around ists circumference in directions generally paralleling that axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 60/54 (2015.10)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9614108 A1 19960517; EP 0790847 A1 19970827; EP 0790847 A4 20000223; EP 0790847 B1 20060614

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-09-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69434766 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2000-02-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970521

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE