Global Patent Index - EP 0791011 B1

EP 0791011 B1 2000-05-17 - BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE TGF-BETA1 AND TGF-BETA2 PEPTIDES

Title (en)

BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE TGF-BETA1 AND TGF-BETA2 PEPTIDES

Title (de)

BIOLOGISCH AKTIVE TGF-BETA1 UND TGF-BETA2 PEPTIDE

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES DE TGF-BETA1 ET TGF-BETA2 BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIFS

Publication

EP 0791011 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94907287 A

Priority

  • US 944893 A
  • US 9400782 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5658883A] The invention relates to peptides corresponding to regions of the amino acid sequence of TGF- beta 1 or TGF- beta 2 which retain, either in monomeric or polymeric forms, at least some of the biological activity of the respective full length TGF- beta . The monomeric form of the peptide derived from TGF- beta 1 comprises the following amino acid sequence: CVRQLYIDFRKDLGWKWIHEPKGYHANFCLGP (SEQ ID NO: 1). The monomeric form of the peptide derived from TGF- beta 2 comprises the following amino acid sequence: CLRPLYIDFKRDLGWKWIHEPKGYNANFCAGA (SEQ ID NO: 2). Dimers may be formed via disulfide bonds between the amino-terminal cysteine residues, the carboxy-terminal cysteine residues, or amino- and carboxy-terminal cysteine residues of the monomer subunits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/495; A61K 38/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/495 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/495 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); Y10S 930/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5658883 A 19970819; AU 6093294 A 19940815; AU 685084 B2 19980115; CA 2153789 A1 19940804; CA 2153789 C 20070417; DE 69424576 D1 20000621; DE 69424576 T2 20010118; EP 0791011 A2 19970827; EP 0791011 B1 20000517; ES 2146253 T3 20000801; JP 3763479 B2 20060405; JP H08510443 A 19961105; US 5420243 A 19950530; WO 9417099 A2 19940804; WO 9417099 A3 19950105

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100122

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100121

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100121

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2002-11-20 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2002-08-14 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2002-05-17 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2002-02-22 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2001-11-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-09-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010121

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146253 T3

2000-07-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. DR. CAVATTONI ING. A. RAIMONDI

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424576 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 07K 14/495 A, 6A 61K 38/18 B

1999-10-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 07K 14/495 A, 6A 61K 38/18 B

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981209

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950428

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT