Global Patent Index - EP 0791164 B1

EP 0791164 B1 2000-04-26 - SMOKE HAND GRENADE

Title (en)

SMOKE HAND GRENADE

Title (de)

RAUCHGANDGRANATE

Title (fr)

GRENADE FUMIGENE A MAIN

Publication

EP 0791164 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95937226 A

Priority

  • NO 9500200 W
  • NO 944305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9615421A1] The present invention relates to an arrangement in a smoke hand grenade, and for the objective of achieving an instantaneous creation of a smoke screen, specifically for self screening of an individual soldier, there is according to the invention suggested a container holding a liquid smoke material (9a) separated from a composition (8a) which after bursting neutralizes the acid by-products being formed after the liquid has reacted with the air moisture whilst emitting smoke.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/48 (2013.01); F42B 27/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9615421 A1 19960523; AT 192232 T 20000515; DE 69516536 D1 20000531; DE 69516536 T2 20000914; DK 0791164 T3 20000828; EP 0791164 A1 19970827; EP 0791164 B1 20000426; NO 180216 B1 19970324; NO 180216 B 19961125; NO 180216 C 19970305; NO 944305 A 19960513; NO 944305 D0 19941111

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-07-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-09 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-03-10 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2003-12-19 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-10-24 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-08 [REG DK EGE] RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS: APPROVED

2003-09-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-14 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2002-11-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516536 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192232 T 20000515

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990511

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970514

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE