Global Patent Index - EP 0791191 B1

EP 0791191 B1 2000-03-29 - MYSTERY CLOCK

Title (en)

MYSTERY CLOCK

Title (de)

GEHEIMNISVOLLE UHR

Title (fr)

PENDULE "MYSTERIEUSE"

Publication

EP 0791191 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96931872 A

Priority

  • FR 9601454 W
  • FR 9510912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711412A1] A clock, known as a "mystery" clock as it is almost entirely transparent, is disclosed. The clock comprises a transparent dial with reading indicia (11), a minute indicator that is transparent except in the region of a clock hand (28'), and an hour indicator that is also transparent except in the region of a clock hand (26'). The indicators and the dial have a common axis (Y) and are supported by a frame or rim (20), and the indicators and/or the dial have peripheral teeth concealed behind said rim (20) for rotating the indicators and the dial relative to the rim (20) about said axis (Y). Said clock further comprises a fixed frame (2) having a fixed axis (X) and movably supporting said rim (20); first drive means (19, 18') for rotating said rim (20) and the indicators and dial thereon about said fixed axis (X) in a predetermined direction and at a predetermined angular speed; and second drive means (17, 22) responsive to the rotation of the rim (20) for rotating said dial and/or said minute indicator and/or said hour indicator about said axis (Y) by engaging the circumference thereof to cause relative rotation of said indicators and said dial and thus provide an instant indication of the time by means of the relative angular positions of said indicators with respect to the dial.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 45/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 45/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 45/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711412 A1 19970327; AU 7088796 A 19970409; CN 1166882 A 19971203; DE 69607455 D1 20000504; EP 0791191 A1 19970827; EP 0791191 B1 20000329; FR 2741967 A1 19970606; FR 2741967 B1 19980220; JP H10509520 A 19980914; US 5878003 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAN CLEEF & ARPELS

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001103

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001009

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000928

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INTERPAT LAW AG

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607455 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981022

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970616

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI