Global Patent Index - EP 0791400 B1

EP 0791400 B1 2000-05-03 - Process and apparatus for coating an object

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for coating an object

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen einer Beschichtung auf einen Gegenstand

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour revêtir un objet

Publication

EP 0791400 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120821 A

Priority

CH 44796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791400A1] The method involves feeding coating particles along a delivery line (16) with a fluid flow to emanate in a coating area of the object (2-7). Part of the fluid flow is extracted from the flow line before the outflow region (22). The fluid is separated into a particle-free and a particle-rich flow in the extraction region. The extracted part of the fluid flow originates in the particle-free flow. The extraction is performed by using the wt. difference between the particles and fluid, esp. at a curve in the flow line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 13/06; B05B 7/14; B05B 15/04; B05D 1/12; B05D 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/14 (2006.01); B05B 13/06 (2006.01); B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B05D 1/12 (2006.01); B05D 7/22 (2006.01); C23C 24/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/1404 (2013.01); B05B 13/0618 (2013.01); B05B 15/0412 (2013.01); B05D 1/12 (2013.01); B05D 7/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791400 A1 19970827; EP 0791400 B1 20000503; DE 59605130 D1 20000608; JP H09234413 A 19970909; TW 341551 B 19981001; US 5863600 A 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051223

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2004-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605130 20000608

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1999-05-06 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ELPATRONIC AG

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980729

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980227

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI