Global Patent Index - EP 0791410 B1

EP 0791410 B1 2001-12-19 - Multi-roll rolling stand

Title (en)

Multi-roll rolling stand

Title (de)

Mehrwalzengerüst

Title (fr)

Cage de laminoir à plusieurs cylindres

Publication

EP 0791410 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102574 A

Priority

  • DE 29603117 U
  • DE 19620704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5842368A] A six-high multi-roll stand (1), has one top and one bottom work roll (2, 3) which are supported in chocks (4, 5), with one top and one bottom intermediate roll (6, 7) which are supported in chocks (8, 9), and with one top and one bottom back-up roll (10, 11) with bearings located in one top and one bottom chock (12, 13). Two functional units are integrated into windows (16) of two roll housings (14, 15) with four each hydraulic operating cylinder units (18, 18, 19, 19) located symmetrically and parallel to roll axis plan 17-17), each operating cylinder unit (18, 19) consisting of top operating cylinder (18a, 19a) with top actuating piston (20a, 21a) which acts on chock (12) of top back-up roll (10) and bottom operating cylinder (18b, 19b) with bottom actuating piston 20b, 21b) which acts on chock (13) of bottom back-up roll (11) for counterbalancing back-up roll (10), and two operating cylinders (18a, 18b; 19a, 19b) of each operating cylinder unit (18, 19) in common cylinder housing (22, 23). Double-acting actuating sleeves (24a, 24b; 25a, 25b) cause bending of intermediate rolls (6, 7) and work rolls (2, 3) and engage chocks (8, 9; 4, 5) of intermediate rolls (6, 7) and work rolls (2, 3) by means of projections (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/10; B21B 29/00; B21B 31/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/32 (2006.01); B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 29/00 (2006.01); B21B 31/10 (2006.01); B21B 31/20 (2006.01); B21B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/10 (2013.01); B21B 29/00 (2013.01); B21B 31/203 (2013.01); B21B 2013/025 (2013.01); B21B 2013/028 (2013.01); B21B 2031/206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5842368 A 19981201; EP 0791410 A2 19970827; EP 0791410 A3 19981028; EP 0791410 B1 20011219; ES 2167629 T3 20020516; JP 3950193 B2 20070725; JP H1015602 A 19980120

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130219

2014-04-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130218

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130218

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705832

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130218

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167629 T3

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705832 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT