Global Patent Index - EP 0791456 B1

EP 0791456 B1 2000-04-19 - Method and means for cleaning the surface of a printing machine cylinder

Title (en)

Method and means for cleaning the surface of a printing machine cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen einer Druckmaschinenzylinderoberfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour nettoyer la surface d'un cylindre d'une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0791456 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101415 A

Priority

DE 19607037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791456A1] The procedure and equipment are used as a means of cleaning cylindrical printing press surfaces. An aqueous, alkaline cleaning solution is applied to the surfaces, and left for a specific interval. It is then removed, using a cleaning fluid. Also claimed is a device carrying out the procedure. This has a distribution roller for cleaning fluids which can be moved to or from the surfaces of the printing machine cylinder. The distribution roller has a supply unit for cleaning solution, with a dosing unit controlling its quantity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41N 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/06 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41N 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/06 (2013.01); B41F 35/006 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0004605 A1 19791017 - ROLAND OFFSETMASCHF [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791456 A1 19970827; EP 0791456 B1 20000419; AT 191882 T 20000515; DE 19607037 A1 19970904; DE 19607037 C2 19990325; DK 0791456 T3 20000918; ES 2146043 T3 20000716; JP 3014655 B2 20000228; JP H09234857 A 19970909; US 5911175 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701459

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110130

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010122

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010118

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20001227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146043 T3

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701459 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191882 T 20000515

1999-12-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981022

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970212

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE