Global Patent Index - EP 0791474 B1

EP 0791474 B1 2002-11-27 - Ink jet recording sheet and ink jet recording method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording sheet and ink jet recording method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsschicht und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Feuille pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre et procédé d'enregistrement par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0791474 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97102898 A

Priority

  • JP 3520896 A
  • JP 2651897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791474A2] A recording medium is provided which enables a good print to be formed on both surfaces thereof and, when printing on one surface of the recording medium is performed under conditions different from that in the printing on the other surface of the recording medium, causes neither curling nor strike through of the print. The recording medium comprises: a substrate having two faces; and an ink-receptive layer or a coat layer provided on both faces of the substrate to form a first sruface and a second surface opposite the first surface, wherein when a droplet of an ink in an identical amount is deposited onto the first and second surfaces of the recording medium, the diameter of a dot formed on the first surface is different from that of a dot formed on the second surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/529 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791474 A2 19970827; EP 0791474 A3 19980107; EP 0791474 B1 20021127; DE 69717326 D1 20030109; DE 69717326 T2 20030327; HK 1002652 A1 20030411; JP 3913822 B2 20070509; JP H09286166 A 19971104

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170220

2017-03-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170220

2017-02-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69717326

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717326 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT