Global Patent Index - EP 0791683 B1

EP 0791683 B1 2000-01-05 - Method for the production of cellulose pulp

Title (en)

Method for the production of cellulose pulp

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von zellulosischem Zellstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation de pâte à papier

Publication

EP 0791683 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200443 A

Priority

IT MI960336 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791683A1] The use of the annual plant known as Luffa cylindrica in methods for the production of cellulose pulp for use in papermaking is described. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791683 A1 19970827; EP 0791683 B1 20000105; ES 2142651 T3 20000416; GR 3033055 T3 20000831; IT 1282671 B1 19980331; IT MI960336 A1 19970825; IT MI960336 D0 19960223; PT 791683 E 20000630; TR 9700149 A2 19970921

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-05-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2003-02-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030215

2002-01-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142651 T3

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20000121

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR PT

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASSIDOMAN ITALIA S.P.A.

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980428

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980218

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR PT