Global Patent Index - EP 0791705 B1

EP 0791705 B1 2000-11-08 - Electronic door lock

Title (en)

Electronic door lock

Title (de)

Elektronisches Türschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte électronique

Publication

EP 0791705 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101414 A

Priority

DE 29602962 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791705A1] The door lock has a door plate with a rotary door handle on each side of the door, with an input device on the outside of the door for input of an entry code which is compared with a stored code, to allow the door to be opened via the outside door handle. The door handles are coupled via a shaft (4) with an armature plate (71) cooperating with an electromagnet (7) operated for releasing the shaft for rotation when the compared codes are the same and for blocking the rotation of the shaft when an incorrect code is entered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/06; E05B 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0673 (2013.01); E05B 63/0065 (2013.01); E05B 17/04 (2013.01); E05B 47/0006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602962 U1 19970619; EP 0791705 A1 19970827; EP 0791705 B1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050130

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-02-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-14

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991008

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980218

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT