Global patent index - EP 0791712 B1

EP 0791712 B1 2000-05-03 - Wide-angle hinge

Title (en)

Wide-angle hinge

Title (de)

Weitwinkelscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière à grand angle d'ouverture

Publication

EP 0791712 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102177 A

Priority

  • AT 34296 A
  • AT 68696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791712A1] The basic body (4) is fixed to a wall (1) of the furniture, and the hinge casing (3) fixed to a door leaf (2). The basic body and hinge casing are joined by articulated levers (5,7). One articulated lever runs in guide grooves (15) on the basic body and is joined to it by further levers. The second articulated lever is linked to a slide piece (6) on the side of the basic body. A gearwheel (8) with two gear rims (9,10) of different diameter engages with a toothed rack on the basic body. One gear rim engages with a toothed rack on one of the articulated levers. The other gear rim engages with a toothed rack on the slide piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/183 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/71 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791712 A1 19970827; EP 0791712 B1 20000503; AT 192537 T 20000515; DE 59701550 D1 20000608; ES 2145526 T3 20000701

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160502

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090213

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090213

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145526

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192537

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990601

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971112

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT