Global Patent Index - EP 0791733 B1

EP 0791733 B1 2002-11-13 - Multiple chamber expansion device for a cooling/heating circuit of a vehicle

Title (en)

Multiple chamber expansion device for a cooling/heating circuit of a vehicle

Title (de)

Mehrkammerexpansioneinrichtung für einen Kühlungs-Heizungskreis eines Kraftwagens

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'expansion à chambres multiples pour circuit de refroidissement/chauffage de véhicule

Publication

EP 0791733 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97102247 A

Priority

FR 9602067 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791733A1] Three expansion chambers (10,11,12) are horizontally aligned in a long rigid casing (1). The casing is formed from two hollow moulded parts welded at their peripheral edges (8) in a vertical joint plane. These edges are thickened and hollowed by a groove (20) extending along their periphery. This groove define a conduits (31) connecting the first and second chambers through a pressure limiting valve (36), and discharging in the upper part of the first chamber. The pressure limiting valve opens to allow discharge of liquid or gas from the second chamber when its pressure attains a predetermined value. The second and third chambers are connected by a second conduit (32,33) through the first valve. A second pressure limiting valve (44) carried by this conduit enables fluid from the third chamber to discharge into the second chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791733 A1 19970827; EP 0791733 B1 20021113; BR 9701014 A 19981103; DE 69716980 D1 20021219; DE 69716980 T2 20030717; FR 2745069 A1 19970822; FR 2745069 B1 19980410; US 5829268 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69716980

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716980 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT