Global Patent Index - EP 0791780 B1

EP 0791780 B1 2001-12-19 - Vehicle headlight with a single light source for dipped and distance light

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight with a single light source for dipped and distance light

Title (de)

Fahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einziger Lichtquelle für Ablendlicht und Fernlicht

Title (fr)

Projecteur de vehicule automobile, comportant une source lumineuse unique et susceptible d'emettre un faisceau de croisement et un faisceau de route

Publication

EP 0791780 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400367 A

Priority

FR 9602061 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791780A1] The motor vehicle headlamp has a single filament bulb mounted on its reflector. The reflector is mounted at three points forming the corners of a triangle. To alter the beam height between high and low beam one of the corners of the triangle is displaced, moving between two discrete positions. There is a single displacement actuator (CR), which acts on a single mounting point (V) vertically below a fixed point (PF). The movable mounting point is also connected to an adjuster to set the initial aim of the headlamp. This may be manually operated or dynamically operated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; B60Q 1/068; B60Q 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/06 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/675 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791780 A1 19970827; EP 0791780 B1 20011219; DE 69709200 D1 20020131; DE 69709200 T2 20020822; ES 2170343 T3 20020801; FR 2745061 A1 19970822; FR 2745061 B1 19980507; JP H09315211 A 19971209; US 6238071 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130220

2014-04-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709200

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120219

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120219

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-18 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20060610

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170343 T3

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709200 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7B 60Q 1/14 B, 7B 60Q 1/068 B

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980126

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT