Global Patent Index - EP 0791789 A3

EP 0791789 A3 2000-03-15 - Discrete type air conditioner

Title (en)

Discrete type air conditioner

Title (de)

Klimaanlage vom diskreten Typ

Title (fr)

Dispositif de climatisation du type discret

Publication

EP 0791789 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97102912 A

Priority

JP 6215396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791789A2] The present invention has an object to enhance a working efficiency in installing an outdoor unit of a discrete type air conditioner on a wall surface. A discrete type air conditioner according to the present invention is equipped with main body side installation members 2a and a wall surface side installation member 2b which are joined with each other for installing an outdoor unit main body on a wall surface. Speaking concretely, the outdoor unit main body is suspended by engaging hook-shaped connectors 5 which are formed to be open downward on upper portions of the main body side installation members 2a with a connector 8 which is formed to be open upward on the wall surface side installation member 2b attached to a house wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/40 (2011.01); F24F 1/62 (2011.01); F24F 1/64 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/32 (2013.01); F24F 1/46 (2013.01); F24F 1/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791789 A2 19970827; EP 0791789 A3 20000315; EP 0791789 B1 20040107; CN 1103430 C 20030319; CN 1162726 A 19971022; CN 1172126 C 20041020; CN 1173133 C 20041027; CN 1380519 A 20021120; CN 1380520 A 20021120; ES 2213787 T3 20040901; JP 3433338 B2 20030804; JP H09229428 A 19970905

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120411

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110221

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2213787

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT PT

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT PT

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT PT