Global Patent Index - EP 0791800 B1

EP 0791800 B1 2002-09-18 - Anti-missile missiles

Title (en)

Anti-missile missiles

Title (de)

Anti-Raketen Rakete

Title (fr)

Missile anti-missile

Publication

EP 0791800 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96102569 A

Priority

EP 96102569 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791800A1] An anti-missile missile for preventing an incoming threat missile from impacting a target without requiring impact of the anti-missile missile with the incoming threat missile. The incoming threat missile is provided with a guidance and control system disposed for receiving a source of guidance energy from an external source for guiding the threat missile to impact with the target. The anti-missile missile includes a body having a container carried thereby and a shield device carried in the container for ejection from the container in the vicinity of the threat missile. The shield device is disposed for controlling the amount of guidance energy received by the guidance and control system thereby rendering the guidance and control system ineffective to guide the threat missile to the target. An ejection device is provided for ejecting the shield device in the vicinity of the threat missile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791800 A1 19970827; EP 0791800 B1 20020918; DE 69623748 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090221

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090221

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623748 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980416

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980224

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE