Global Patent Index - EP 0791854 B1

EP 0791854 B1 2003-06-25 - Device for developing sheet-like or tape-like photographic material

Title (en)

Device for developing sheet-like or tape-like photographic material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entwickeln von blattförmigem oder bandförmigem fotografischem Material

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le développement de matériel photographique en forme de feuille ou de bande

Publication

EP 0791854 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810100 A

Priority

EP 96810100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791854A1] Recesses (10a-c,20a-c) are positioned in the walls (10,20) of two interconnected half-shells (1,2). Two ladder-shaped elements have first conveyor rollers. A central element holds the ladder-shaped elements in position and forms, together with the ladder-shaped element and the wall of the half-shells, a duct for the photographic material to be developed. The central element has second conveyor rollers in contact with the first conveyor elements. It ensures that the photographic material to be developed is guided between the first and second conveyor rollers through the duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 3/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/06 (2006.01); G03D 3/08 (2006.01); G03D 3/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791854 A1 19970827; EP 0791854 B1 20030625; CA 2197834 A1 19970821; CN 1104660 C 20030402; CN 1167927 A 19971217; DE 59610556 D1 20030731; JP H09319053 A 19971212; US 5875371 A 19990223

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050220

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610556 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMIP LLC

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980129

1998-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNECHT, HUGO

1998-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WACKER, RUDOLF

1998-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DECH, RUDOLF

1998-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: POLI, GABRIELE

1998-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCODELLARO, ENI

1998-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EARLE, ANTHONY

1997-11-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI