Global Patent Index - EP 0791975 B1

EP 0791975 B1 2003-06-11 - Contacting of a flat antenna conductor structure

Title (en)

Contacting of a flat antenna conductor structure

Title (de)

Kontaktierung einer flächigen Antennenleiterstruktur

Title (fr)

Connexion de strucure d'antenne platte

Publication

EP 0791975 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101602 A

Priority

DE 19605999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791975A2] The flat antenna structure consists of a first contact part (5) on a vehicle installation area (7). There is a second means of contact (4) to the bodywork, in the shape of a spring element which is fastened to a contact foot (3.1). A contact arm (3.2) is fixed to the contact foot and both form a non-conducting support (3), usually a part of the housing (2), for a signal processing unit. Both the support and the housing are connected to the coachwork (1), and between the installation (7) and the coachwork, there is an adhesive bead (6) to attach the part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01R 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 1/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1271 (2013.01); H01R 13/2421 (2013.01); H01R 13/2442 (2013.01); H01R 13/245 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/02 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19605999 A1 19970821; DE 19605999 C2 19991014; EP 0791975 A2 19970827; EP 0791975 A3 19990310; EP 0791975 B1 20030611; JP H1056317 A 19980224; US 6025806 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070203

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060203

2006-10-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060204

2006-02-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060203

2005-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710245 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011212

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990224

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE