Global patent index - EP 0791988 B1

EP 0791988 B1 2001-01-03 - Plastic hammer brush holder

Title (en)

Plastic hammer brush holder

Title (de)

Kunststoff-Hammerbürstenhalter

Title (fr)

Porte-balai à marteau en matière plastique

Publication

EP 0791988 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102346 A

Priority

DE 19607196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0791988A1] The brush holder has a seating (1) for enclosing the inserted brush provided at one and of a pivot arm, provided with a 2-point pivot mounting (2) at its other end. The thin-walled coupling section (3) between the opposite ends of the pivot arm is coupled to the seating and the pivot mounting via a respective pair of forks (3.1,3.2 ; 3.3,3.4). The top surface of the coupling section may be provided with a reception into which a noise suppression coil is fitted..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/39 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0791988 A1 19970827; EP 0791988 B1 20010103; DE 19607196 A1 19970828; US 5753994 A 19980519

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELL, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120125

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702833

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000518

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970918

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT