Global Patent Index - EP 0792028 A3

EP 0792028 A3 2001-12-12 - Solid-state antenna switch and field-effect transistor

Title (en)

Solid-state antenna switch and field-effect transistor

Title (de)

Halbleiterantennenschalter und Feldeffekttransistor

Title (fr)

Commutateur d'antenne à semi-conducteur et transistor à effet de champ

Publication

EP 0792028 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97101898 A

Priority

JP 3322196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0792028A2] A field-effect transistor has a covering electrode overlying at least part of the transistor's channel. The covering electrode is formed on an insulating layer that covers the source, gate, and drain of the transistor. One voltage is applied to the covering electrode when the field-effect transistor is switched on. Another voltage is applied when the field-effect transistor is switched off, creating an electric field that hinders current flow in the channel. In an antenna switch, this type of transistor couples an antenna to a receiving circuit, and another transistor couples the antenna to a transmitting circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/48; H03K 17/687

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/822 (2006.01); H01L 21/338 (2006.01); H01L 27/04 (2006.01); H01L 29/812 (2006.01); H01Q 1/00 (2006.01); H01Q 3/00 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01); H03K 17/687 (2006.01); H04B 1/40 (2006.01); H04B 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/402 (2013.01); H01L 29/8124 (2013.01); H03K 17/687 (2013.01); H04B 1/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4947232 A 19900807 - ASHIDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4757362 A 19880712 - BIWA TETUO [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0409374 A2 19910123 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
  • [A] KOHAMA K ET AL: "HIGH POWER DPDT ANTENNA SWITCH MMIC FOR DIGITAL CELLULAR SYSTEMS", IEEE GALLIUM ARSENIDE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS (GAAS IC) SYMPOSIUM. 17TH. ANNUAL TECHNICAL DIGEST 1995. SAN DIEGO, OCT. 29 - NOV. 1, 1995, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. SYMP. 17, 29 October 1995 (1995-10-29), pages 75 - 78, XP000630154, ISBN: 0-7803-2967-8
  • [A] UDA H ET AL: "HIGH-PERFORMANCE GAAS SWITCH ICS FABRICATED USING MESFETS WITH TWO KINDS OF PINCH-OFF VOLTAGES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GALLIUM ARSENIDE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS SYMPOSIUM. (GAAS IC). SAN JOSE, OCT. 10 - 13, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. SYMP. 15, 10 October 1993 (1993-10-10), pages 247 - 250, XP000462982

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0792028 A2 19970827; EP 0792028 A3 20011212; CN 1113417 C 20030702; CN 1166694 A 19971203; JP H09232827 A 19970905; US 5872369 A 19990216

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04B 1/48 A, 7H 03K 17/687 B

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB