Global Patent Index - EP 0792170 A4

EP 0792170 A4 2000-03-15 - RADIONUCLIDE METAL CHELATES FOR THE RADIOLABELING OF LIGANDS, ANTI-LIGANDS OR OTHER PROTEINS

Title (en)

RADIONUCLIDE METAL CHELATES FOR THE RADIOLABELING OF LIGANDS, ANTI-LIGANDS OR OTHER PROTEINS

Title (de)

RADIONUKLID-CHELATVERBINDUNGEN ZUR RADIOMARKIERUNG VON LIGANDEN, ANTILIGANDEN ODER VERSCHIEDENEN PROTEINEN

Title (fr)

CHELATES METALLIQUES DE RADIONUCLIDES UTILISES POUR LE RADIOMARQUAGE DE LIGANDS, D'ANTI-LIGANDS ET AUTRES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 0792170 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94924458 A

Priority

  • US 9407733 W
  • US 9042193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9502418A1] Chelating compounds of specified structure are useful for radiolabeling targeting proteins such as antibodies as well as proteinaceous and non-proteinaceous ligands and anti-ligands. The radiolabeled antibodies, ligands or anti-ligands, or catabolites thereof, demonstrate improved biodistribution properties, including reduced localization within the intestines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 51/04; A61K 51/10; C07F 13/00; C07K 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 51/04 (2006.01); A61K 51/10 (2006.01); C07F 13/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/06139 (2013.01); A61K 51/0497 (2013.01); A61K 51/1054 (2013.01); C07F 13/005 (2013.01); C07K 5/0606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9502418 A1 19950126; CA 2165052 A1 19950126; EP 0792170 A1 19970903; EP 0792170 A4 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEORX CORPORATION

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-03-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 51/04 A, 7A 61K 51/10 B, 7C 07K 5/06 B, 7C 07F 13/00 B

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960212

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE