Global Patent Index - EP 0792669 B1

EP 0792669 B1 2001-12-05 - Method for energizing energization-operated toy element and energization-operated toy

Title (en)

Method for energizing energization-operated toy element and energization-operated toy

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Energieversorgung eines Spielzeugelements und Spielzeugs

Title (fr)

Méthode d'alimentation énergétique d'un jouet et jouet

Publication

EP 0792669 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96301338 A

Priority

EP 96301338 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0792669A1] A method for energizing an energization-operated toy element in which an electric double layer capacitor is employed as energization means for energizing a toy element which is operated upon application of low voltage, the capacitor is charged upon reception of a current from a DC power source, and the charged electric power is used to energize a toy load as a discharge current to operate the toy element. An energization-operated toy which comprises an energization heating color changing element provided with an energization resistant heating member for generating heat upon application of the DC voltage and a thermal color changing layer disposed in contact with or close to the heating member, energization means consisting of an electric double layer capacitor for generating heat by supplying the discharge current to the energization resistant heating member, and a power source for supplying the DC voltage from 0.5 V to 9.0 V to the capacitor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/26; A63H 33/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/22 (2006.01); A63H 33/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/26 (2013.01); A63H 33/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0792669 A1 19970903; EP 0792669 B1 20011205; DE 69617629 D1 20020117; DE 69617629 T2 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-03-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617629 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE PILOT INK CO., LTD.

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980114

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT