Global Patent Index - EP 0792690 B1

EP 0792690 B1 2001-05-30 - Anvil for centrifugal impact crushers and circular anvil wall provided with such anvils

Title (en)

Anvil for centrifugal impact crushers and circular anvil wall provided with such anvils

Title (de)

Prallkörper für Schleudermühlen und ringförmige Prallwand ausgerüstet mit diesen Prallkörpern

Title (fr)

Enclume pour concasseur à impact centrifuge et cercle d'enclumes équipé de telles enclumes

Publication

EP 0792690 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97200301 A

Priority

BE 9600168 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0792690A1] The anvil is in the shape of a prism with flat upper and lower surfaces (22,24), a curved surface (16) forming part of a circle, two lateral surfaces (18,20) which come to a point, and two other lateral surfaces (26,28) adjacent to the curved surface. The two lateral surfaces adjacent to the curved surface are inclined at an angle between 3 degrees and 15 degrees to the median plane of the anvil and converge towards the upper or lower flat surface. One end of the anvil has projecting studs (26) to engage with holes in a ring, and the anvils are fitted into the ring with their inclined surfaces facing alternately in opposite directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/09 (2006.01); B02C 13/18 (2006.01); B02C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0792690 A1 19970903; EP 0792690 B1 20010530; AT 201614 T 20010615; AU 1263297 A 19970904; AU 703900 B2 19990401; BE 1010037 A3 19971202; BR 9700317 A 19981027; CA 2198170 A1 19970827; CZ 287004 B6 20000816; CZ 9700573 A3 19971112; DE 69704970 D1 20010705; DE 69704970 T2 20011115; ES 2157046 T3 20010801; JP H09225328 A 19970902; MX 9701422 A 19970830; PL 187495 B1 20040730; PL 318631 A1 19970901; PT 792690 E 20011030; SK 25797 A3 19971008; SK 281962 B6 20010911; US 5806774 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070204

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAGOTTEAUX INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060206

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060204

2006-09-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-08-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060206

2006-02-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060204

2006-02-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060204

2005-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050201

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157046 T3

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704970 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201614 T 20010615

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGOTTEAUX INTERNATIONAL

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980122

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT