Global Patent Index - EP 0792742 B1

EP 0792742 B1 2000-02-09 - Sheet transport device and method for guiding sheetlike material in a printing machine, specially in an offset rotary printing machine for sheets

Title (en)

Sheet transport device and method for guiding sheetlike material in a printing machine, specially in an offset rotary printing machine for sheets

Title (de)

Bogentransportvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Führung von bogenförmigem Material in einer Druckmaschine, insbesondere in einer Bogenrotations-Offsetdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport de feuilles et procédé de guidage d'un matériau en feuille dans une machine d'impression, en particulier dans une machine rotative offset pour feuilles

Publication

EP 0792742 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118243 A

Priority

DE 19607397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0792742A1] The guide has nozzles (12,14,16) arranged in zones (6,8,10) inside its guide face. The nozzles (12) in the first zone (6) are formed by blow nozzles whose jet is directed in the transport direction (A) of the sheets. The nozzles (14,16) in the second and third zones (8,10) are formed by nozzle jets directed away from the longitudinal axis of the guide face to its edges. The nozzles of the first zone are biassable with air separable from the nozzles of the second and third zones. A blow nozzle box (18) can be associated with the first zone for supplying the jets with the blow air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00; B65H 5/22; B65H 29/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/00 (2006.01); B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01); B65H 29/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 5/228 (2013.01); B65H 29/245 (2013.01); B65H 2301/30 (2013.01); B65H 2406/1132 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0792742 A1 19970903; EP 0792742 B1 20000209; EP 0792742 B2 20021211; DE 19607397 A1 19970904; JP 3924343 B2 20070606; JP H101238 A 19980106; US 5797327 A 19980825; US 5927203 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604421

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071114

2006-11-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-07-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2003-02-19 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2003-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2002-12-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AG

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604421

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SHEET TRANSPORT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GUIDING SHEETLIKE MATERIAL IN A PRINTING MACHINE, SPECIALLY IN AN OFFSET ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE FOR SHEETS

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961114

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI