Global Patent Index - EP 0792989 B1

EP 0792989 B1 2001-04-25 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière

Publication

EP 0792989 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97890033 A

Priority

AT 38096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0792989A1] The hinge has a pin (12) which connects its two parts together. It has, at one end, a ring bead which forms a stop (13) which restricts insertion into rolling zones (9,10,11) or sleeves of the hinge flaps (3,4). The other hinge flap (15) can be fitted by a rolling zone (14) or sleeve onto a part of the hinge pin projecting beyond the stop. The hinge parts can be made of sheet meal or a zinc casting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/10; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/04 (2013.01); E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05D 11/0018 (2013.01); E05D 2003/027 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0792989 A1 19970903; EP 0792989 B1 20010425; AT 404493 B 19981125; AT A38096 A 19980415; DE 59703412 D1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050226

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-04-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030409

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703412 20010531

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000620

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL