Global Patent Index - EP 0793006 B1

EP 0793006 B1 2002-09-18 - Cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0793006 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119729 A

Priority

DE 19607638 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19607638C1] In the coolant circuit of an internal combustion engine, the venting (15,16) is fitted with a barrier valve (17), to block the passage to the equalising reservoir (12). The barrier valve may be operated according to the coolant temperature, and the pressure in the equalising reservoir. The barrier valve may be arranged in the equalising reservoir and have valve members (25;45,46) that operate through the pressure stemming from the equalising reservoir's position unit (25;46). The valve member (25) may be built as a pressure-discharge piston and connected to a pressure-discharge membrane (45).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/20 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F01P 11/00 (2006.01); F01P 11/02 (2006.01); F16K 17/06 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/029 (2013.01); F01P 11/02 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); F01P 2037/02 (2013.01); F01P 2060/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19607638 C1 19970619; CN 1160123 A 19970924; EP 0793006 A1 19970903; EP 0793006 B1 20020918; JP H09329021 A 19971222; KR 100381353 B1 20030722; US 5836269 A 19981117

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609688

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111210

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111210

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111210

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609688 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980204

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT