Global Patent Index - EP 0793023 B1

EP 0793023 B1 2000-09-27 - Hydraulic system

Title (en)

Hydraulic system

Title (de)

Hydrauliksystem

Title (fr)

Système hydraulique

Publication

EP 0793023 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97103137 A

Priority

DE 19607479 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0793023A1] A hydraulic system comprises at least one control unit (10,12) and at least one actuator (14) which is connected via conduits (16,18) to the control unit and which can be driven via the latter in reciprocating motion against and with a load acting on the actuator, in particular upwards and downwards against gravity. The system further comprises a pressure-compensating valve (78) for matching the pressure in the conduit (16), which serves as a return conduit during movement of the actuator (14) with the load, to the load pressure by replenishing the return conduit from the feed conduit (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 17/00 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); E06C 5/06 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/02 (2006.01); F15B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 5/06 (2013.01); E02F 9/2225 (2013.01); F15B 11/003 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3116 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3138 (2013.01); F15B 2211/31576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/31588 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/413 (2013.01); F15B 2211/41527 (2013.01); F15B 2211/426 (2013.01); F15B 2211/455 (2013.01); F15B 2211/46 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50518 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50545 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50581 (2013.01); F15B 2211/513 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5153 (2013.01); F15B 2211/528 (2013.01); F15B 2211/55 (2013.01); F15B 2211/555 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0793023 A1 19970903; EP 0793023 B1 20000927; AT 196674 T 20001015; DE 19607479 A1 19970904; ES 2151692 T3 20010101; JP H09324802 A 19971216

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040227

2005-02-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050226

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040226

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040226

2004-02-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151692 T3

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703170 20001102

2000-10-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196674 T 20001015

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980223

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI