Global Patent Index - EP 0793059 B1

EP 0793059 B1 2000-02-02 - Control and monitoring equipment for gas burners

Title (en)

Control and monitoring equipment for gas burners

Title (de)

Regelungs- und Überwachungsschaltung eines Gasbrenners

Title (fr)

Circuit de régulation et de sûreté d'un brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 0793059 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97107692 A

Priority

  • EP 93116050 A
  • IT VI920148 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0591910A1] The invention discloses a control and monitoring equipment for gas burners which is characterized in that when the figure of the reference physical value to be monitored has been reached, if the flame continues to burn in the burner after the safety gas solenoid valve has been de-energized, the feeding of the motor (M) of the electric fan supplying air for the combustion continues, said feeding being insured by the closing of the contacts (B1, B2) placed before the motor (M) of the electric fan, before a first relay (B) belonging to the power circuit and which is excited by the closing of a normally closed contact (1E), wherein said normally closed contact belongs to a second de-energized relay (E) inserted in the logic part of the equipment, said second relay (E) being placed in series to a first resistance (BLG) wound around a bi-metallic element and in parallel with a closed contact (2RF) belonging to the flame monitoring logic circuit (A RF), the feeding of the motor (M) ceasing when the flame goes out because of the commutation of the contact (2RF) belonging to the flame monitoring logic circuit (A RF). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/20; F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/20 (2006.01); F23N 5/24 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/203 (2013.01); F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 5/18 (2013.01); F23N 2005/182 (2013.01); F23N 2023/24 (2013.01); F23N 2023/38 (2013.01); F23N 2025/04 (2013.01); F23N 2025/08 (2013.01); F23N 2027/04 (2013.01); F23N 2027/36 (2013.01); F23N 2033/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01); F23N 2035/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0591910 A1 19940413; EP 0591910 B1 19980422; AT 165434 T 19980515; DE 69318092 D1 19980528; DE 69327811 D1 20000309; EP 0793059 A2 19970903; EP 0793059 A3 19971001; EP 0793059 B1 20000202; IT 1259837 B 19960328; IT VI920148 A1 19940408; IT VI920148 D0 19921007

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-06-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69327811 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 591910

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981210

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971106

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BORELLI, LUIGI

1997-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FERRARI, ALBERTO

1997-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAGLIAFERRO, BRUNO

1997-09-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 591910

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI