Global Patent Index - EP 0793212 B1

EP 0793212 B1 2000-03-15 - Control method for a display screen with gradation display and display device for carrying out the same

Title (en)

Control method for a display screen with gradation display and display device for carrying out the same

Title (de)

Steuerverfahren für eine Bildanzeigetafel mit Halbtönen und Anzeigeeinrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un écran de visualisation d'image affichant des demi-teintes, et dispositif de visualisation mettant en oeuvre le procédé

Publication

EP 0793212 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400389 A

Priority

FR 9602393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0793212A1] The display is controlled by placing each display cell in the 'dark' state or the 'bright' state for a succession of sub-intervals (S1 to S8) determined by the level of luminance required for each cell. The sub-intervals vary, depending on the luminance required. The sub-intervals lie within a given cycle time (P1). In addition, for the rows controlling the cells, the order of the distribution of the sub-periods is adjusted to reduce the amplitude of variations of charge (Q1, Q2) applied to the controller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09F 9/313 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2022 (2013.01); G09G 3/294 (2013.01); G09G 3/297 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0266 (2013.01); G09G 2330/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0793212 A1 19970903; EP 0793212 B1 20000315; CN 1110941 C 20030604; CN 1180274 A 19980429; DE 69701413 D1 20000420; DE 69701413 T2 20000907; FR 2745410 A1 19970829; FR 2745410 B1 19980605; JP H09237061 A 19970909; US 6067060 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040221

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040221

2003-03-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701413 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON-CSF

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON MULTIMEDIA

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980508

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON-CSF

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON MULTIMEDIA

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970909

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT