Global Patent Index - EP 0793250 B1

EP 0793250 B1 2000-01-05 - Electron gun assembling apparatus and method of assembling electron gun

Title (en)

Electron gun assembling apparatus and method of assembling electron gun

Title (de)

Elektronenkanone-Montageeinrichtung und Montageverfahren der Elektronenkanone

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage d'un canon à électron et procédé d'assemblage d'un canon à électron

Publication

EP 0793250 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96112119 A

Priority

JP 4196996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0793250A1] An electron gun assembling apparatus comprises a cathode driving mechanism (12,13) for moving a cathode (1), a laser displacement gage (14) to measure a height of a surface of the cathode (1) in a non-contact manner at a cathode surface measuring position outside an electron gun assembly (24), an electric micrometer (11) to measure a height of an upper surface of a first electrode (3) in the electron gun assembly (24), and an electric micrometer (8) to measure a height of a lower surface of a second electrode (4) in the electron gun assembly (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/18 (2013.01); H01J 2209/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0793250 A1 19970903; EP 0793250 B1 20000105; CN 1073270 C 20011017; CN 1158488 A 19970903; DE 69606017 D1 20000210; DE 69606017 T2 20000803; JP 3338275 B2 20021028; JP H09237574 A 19970909; KR 100207166 B1 19990715; US 5749760 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070726

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070726

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070726

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606017 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971002

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970904

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT