Global Patent Index - EP 0793439 B1

EP 0793439 B1 2000-01-26 - A METHOD FOR WAREWASHING WITHOUT BLEACH

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR WAREWASHING WITHOUT BLEACH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM GESCHIRRWASCHEN OHNE VERWENDUNG VON BLEICHMITTELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LAVAGE INDUSTRIEL DE VAISSELLE SANS AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT

Publication

EP 0793439 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95940999 A

Priority

  • EP 9504606 W
  • GB 9423234 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9615710A1] A chemical cleaning system and a method of mechanical warewashing using same is described. The system contains at least two separate components for aqueous dissolution or dilution to respective use concentrations, a cleaning agent and an enzyme. Substantially no added bleaching agent is present in the system and a pH of an aqueous solution of the cleaning agent must be more alkaline than an aqueous solution of the enzymatic component by at least 1 pH unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 11/0023 (2013.01); C11D 11/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9615710 A1 19960530; AU 4255096 A 19960617; AU 713330 B2 19991202; BR 9509918 A 19970930; CA 2202162 A1 19950530; DE 69514824 D1 20000302; DE 69514824 T2 20000615; EP 0793439 A1 19970910; EP 0793439 B1 20000126; ES 2142504 T3 20000416; GB 9423234 D0 19950104; JP H10509990 A 19980929; ZA 9509924 B 19970522

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001024

2010-04-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CHEMISCHE FABRIK DR. WEIGERT (GMBH & CO.)

- Effective date: 20001025

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-08-06 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050809

2008-08-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20050809

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2003-08-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001024

2003-08-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CHEMISCHE FABRIK DR. WEIGERT (GMBH & CO.)

- Effective date: 20001025

2003-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-12-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CHEMISCHE FABRIK DR. WEIGERT (GMBH & CO.)

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142504 T3

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514824 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980316

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970402

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT