Global Patent Index - EP 0793469 B9

EP 0793469 B9 2002-12-11 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A COMPOSITE ABSORBENT CORE

Title (en)

ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A COMPOSITE ABSORBENT CORE

Title (de)

ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINEM VERBUNDABSORPTIONSKERN

Title (fr)

ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT UNE PARTIE CENTRALE COMPOSITE ET ABSORBANTE

Publication

EP 0793469 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 95937645 A

Priority

  • US 9513853 W
  • US 34477794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5853402A] Disclosed is a distinctive composite absorbent core and an absorbent article incorporating the same. The absorbent core comprises at least one absorbent portion and at least one porous resilient portion. The porous resilient portion is located adjacent the absorbent portion and has a wet compression recovery of at least about 85 percent. The porous resilient portion may have a basis weight of from about 50 to about 250 grams per square meter and a density of not more than about 0.050 grams per cubic centimeter. In a particular aspect, the porous resilient portion has a mean pore size of at least about 1.50 millimeters. In a particular aspect, the absorbent article incorporates the absorbent core and has an absorbent core crotch width dimension which may be no more than about 6.35 centimeters. In another particular aspect, the absorbent article also has a fluid intake rate of at least about 10 milliliters per second.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/53 (2006.01); A61F 5/44 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/49 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/534 (2013.01); A61F 13/15203 (2013.01); A61F 13/535 (2013.01); A61F 13/53713 (2013.01); A61F 13/53717 (2013.01); A61F 13/53747 (2013.01); A61F 13/5376 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15406 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15422 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15495 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15536 (2013.01); A61F 2013/53791 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5853402 A 19981229; AR 000178 A1 19970521; AU 3969195 A 19960617; AU 703318 B2 19990325; CA 2206289 A1 19960530; DE 69527212 D1 20020801; DE 69527212 T2 20030220; EP 0793469 A1 19970910; EP 0793469 B1 20020626; EP 0793469 B9 20021211; FR 2727009 A1 19960524; FR 2727009 B1 19970718; GB 2295321 A 19960529; GB 2295321 B 19980610; GB 2309646 A 19970806; GB 2309646 B 19980610; GB 9524003 D0 19960124; GB 9707766 D0 19970604; JP H10509365 A 19980914; KR 100479140 B1 20050616; KR 987000035 A 19980330; MX 226150 B 20050208; MX 9703433 A 19970731; PE 2097 A1 19970127; SV 1995000078 A 19970217; TW 341506 B 19981001; WO 9615748 A2 19960530; WO 9615748 A3 19960711; ZA 9509561 B 19960528

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-10-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-09-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69527212 20020801

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT NL SE

2002-06-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990118

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970604

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT NL SE