Global patent index - EP 0793538 B1

EP 0793538 B1 2000-01-12 - COATING OF WAX-LIKE MATERIALS ONTO MOVING STRIP ARTICLES

Title (en)

COATING OF WAX-LIKE MATERIALS ONTO MOVING STRIP ARTICLES

Title (de)

BESCHICHTEN VON MATERIALBAHNEN MIT WACHSARTIGEN STOFFEN

Title (fr)

ENDUCTION DE BANDES MOBILES AVEC DES MATIERES CEROIDES

Publication

EP 0793538 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95937744 A

Priority

  • CA 9500658 W
  • US 34456494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9615857A1] A process of coating a heat-conductive strip article, e.g. aluminum or aluminum alloy strip (14) used in the automotive industry, with a solid wax-like coating material, preferably a wax-type lubricant. The process involves heating a solid wax-like coating material that melts in a temperature range of about 30 to 100 DEG C to form a melt having a viscosity in a range of about 50 centipoise or less and flowing the melt onto a moving surface of the strip article through an elongated slot (15) in a movable coating head having an extended surface adjacent to the slot to form a coating layer on the article. The coating head is pushed towards the surface of the strip article as the melt is flowed as a coating onto the surface from the slot (15) to reduce a coating thickness by pressing the extended surface of the coating head onto the coating as the coating is formed. The process allows a coating of a wax-like material to be formed to a desired thickness and yet allows the wax-like material to solidify shortly after application to the strip article (14) so that the strip can be coiled without providing a cooling run of undue length or special cooling devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; B05C 9/04; B05C 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/04 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B05D 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0295 (2013.01); B05C 5/001 (2013.01); B05C 5/0254 (2013.01); B05C 5/0266 (2013.01); B05C 9/04 (2013.01); B05C 11/1042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9615857 A1 19960530; AT 188631 T 20000115; AU 3866395 A 19960617; AU 690367 B2 19980423; BR 9509911 A 19971014; CA 2205659 A1 19960530; CA 2205659 C 20010123; CN 1070390 C 20010905; CN 1166797 A 19971203; DE 69514542 D1 20000217; DE 69514542 T2 20000531; EP 0793538 A1 19970910; EP 0793538 B1 20000112; JP H10509637 A 19980922; NO 972342 A 19970522; NO 972342 D0 19970522

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041123

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041123

2003-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514542

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188631

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990422

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970512

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE