Global Patent Index - EP 0793711 B1

EP 0793711 B1 2000-04-26 - CLEANING METHOD

Title (en)

CLEANING METHOD

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0793711 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95940201 A

Priority

  • EP 9504537 W
  • GB 9423495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9616159A1] In a method of cleaning glass containers in a continuous feed process, an aqueous composition comprising an alkaline agent and a weak sequestrant. A typical alkaline agent is NaOH. Typical weak sequestrants are polyacrylates (e.g. MW < 10,000) and phosphonates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 7/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 3/361 (2013.01); C11D 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9616159 A1 19960530; AU 4173596 A 19960617; BR 9509693 A 19971014; DE 69516537 D1 20000531; DE 69516537 T2 20000810; EP 0793711 A1 19970910; EP 0793711 B1 20000426; ES 2145937 T3 20000716; FI 972124 A0 19970519; FI 972124 A 19970519; GB 9423495 D0 19950111; ZA 9509795 B 19970519

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-12-12 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SOPURA S.A.

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-11-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001020

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145937 T3

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516537 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990728

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970327

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT