Global Patent Index - EP 0793763 B1

EP 0793763 B1 2000-11-08 - COUPLING FOR ANCHOR BARS

Title (en)

COUPLING FOR ANCHOR BARS

Title (de)

KUPPLUNG FÜR ANKERSTANGEN

Title (fr)

ACCOUPLEMENT DE TIGES D'ANCRAGE

Publication

EP 0793763 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95900550 A

Priority

AT 9400177 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2204544A1] For coupling anchor bars (2) of injection anchors, the anchor bars are screwed with their outer threads (4) into a coupling sleeve (1) provided with a corresponding inner thread (5). One of the two anchor bars (2) screwed into the coupling sleeve (1) has a chamfered surface (8) formed by an end chamfer and lies on a break (6) of the inner thread (5) of the coupling sleeve (1). The second anchor bar (2) is screwed into the coupling sleeve (1) until its end face (9) lies completely on the end face (9) of the other anchor bar (2). This ensures an advantageous transmission of forces during drilling and prevents the coupling sleeve (1) from turning during drilling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/0426 (2013.01); Y10T 403/5746 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CA 2204544 A1 19960606; CA 2204544 C 20050111; AT 197488 T 20001111; AU 690936 B2 19980507; AU 8134394 A 19960619; DE 59409583 D1 20001214; EP 0793763 A1 19970910; EP 0793763 B1 20001108; ES 2152376 T3 20010201; GR 3034800 T3 20010228; US 5888025 A 19990330; WO 9617153 A1 19960606

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131125

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131126

2015-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150406

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131125

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131126

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131125

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409583

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-08-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000402479

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131125

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409583

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHULTE & SCHULTE, DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121206

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409583

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHULTE & SCHULTE, DE

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-02-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-11-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2003-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO MAI GMBH

2003-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO MAI GMBH

- Free text: MAI PUMP AUSTRIA GMBH#WERKSTRASSE 17#9710 FEISTRITZ AN DER DRAU (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ATLAS COPCO MAI GMBH#WERKSTRASSE 17#9710 FREISTRITZ AN DER DRAU (AT)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAI PUMP AUSTRIA G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-02-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-02-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152376 T3

2001-01-08 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409583 20001214

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197488 T 20001111

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000306

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970319

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE