Global patent index - EP 0793920 B1

EP 0793920 B1 2000-11-15 - Insert for snowboardboot

Title (en)

Insert for snowboardboot

Title (de)

Einsatzstück für Snowboardstiefel

Title (fr)

Insert de chaussure de snowboard

Publication

EP 0793920 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97102634 A

Priority

FR 9603009 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0793920A1] The insert comprises a rigid base (2) with a U shaped section transverse to the boot longitudinal direction. A base part (20) is extended laterally upwards by two opposite side parts (21,22). Two side webs (3,4) are connected to the side parts by pivots (50,51). These pivots enable the webs to tip about an axis transverse to the boot longitudinal direction during bending of the leg bottom about the ankle. Stops (60,61) lock forward to rear tipping of the webs during leg rear support. A flexible rear support (7) connected to the webs provides rear support in the calf region. One of the webs has lower (30) and upper portions which are joined by a second pivot (80), above the ankle, which enables lateral inclination of the upper portion during leg bending.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A63C 10/14 (2012.01); A63C 10/24 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/24 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/049 (2013.01); A63C 10/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0793920 A1 19970910; EP 0793920 B1 20001115; AT 197535 T 20001215; DE 69703506 D1 20001221; DE 69703506 T2 20010322; FR 2745692 A1 19970912; FR 2745692 B1 19980529

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2006-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010104

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197535

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000125

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980302

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI