Global Patent Index - EP 0794099 B1

EP 0794099 B1 2000-03-29 - Support of railway vehicles by air spring systems

Title (en)

Support of railway vehicles by air spring systems

Title (de)

Abstützung von Schienenfahrzeugen mittels Luftfedersystemen

Title (fr)

Appui de véhicules ferroviaires par systèmes à ressort pneumatique

Publication

EP 0794099 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119667 A

Priority

DE 19608179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0794099A1] Between the air spring system (2) and the running mechanism (3) a roller device (6) is arranged with a rolling direction orientated crossways to the vehicle. The effective radius of the roller device is virtually the same as or greater than the height of the air spring system and its rolling area is definedly limited. The roller device is formed by a roller plate (8) on the lower support surface of the air spring system, with a central, rounded roller edge (7) and a flat counter bearing surface (9) on the running mechanism. The roller edge on both sides is limited by tangential flat surfaces (10), the opening angle of which defines and limits the rolling area of the device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/02; B61F 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/02 (2006.01); B61F 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/02 (2013.01); B61F 5/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0794099 A1 19970910; EP 0794099 B1 20000329; AT 191188 T 20000415; DE 19608179 A1 19970911

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131207

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131207

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604839

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191188 T

- Effective date: 20131207

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604839

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH

- Free text: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE)

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604839 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191188 T 20000415

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990409

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971010

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT