Global patent index - EP 0794265 A3

EP 0794265 A3 2000-11-22 - Process for making preforms

Title (en)

Process for making preforms

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formteilen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'objets formés

Publication

EP 0794265 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97102995 A

Priority

DE 19608719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0794265A2] Production of moulded parts having a layer of uniform finely ground sintered structure esp. made of metallic material comprises producing a negative form of the moulded part for the contour of one side of the moulded part; and forming the moulded part by applying the layer by means of plasma spraying to the negative form acting as substrate. The moulded part itself is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/18; C23C 4/02; H01M 8/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/185 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0794265 A2 19970910; EP 0794265 A3 20001122; DE 19608719 A1 19970911

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020909

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 23C 4/18 A, 7C 23C 4/02 B, 7H 01M 8/02 B

1998-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-02-25 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI