Global Patent Index - EP 0794307 B1

EP 0794307 B1 2000-07-26 - A hinge for metal doors and windows

Title (en)

A hinge for metal doors and windows

Title (de)

Ein Scharnier für metallische Türen und Fenster

Title (fr)

Une charnière pour portes et fenêtres métalliques

Publication

EP 0794307 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830088 A

Priority

IT BO960107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0794307A1] A hinge for metal doors and windows envisages that each bushing (7,8) be formed of two separate elements (11, 12), engaged with each other by axial coupling means (14, 15) reversible when the bushing (7, 8) is not inside a relative axial hole (9), and free to turn relative to each other: the first element (11) forms a cylinder to contain a pin (6) the hollow for the pin being off centre with respect to a longitudinal axis (X) of the bushing (7, 8); the other element (12) forms a first collar larger in diameter than the corresponding axial hole (9) that contains the bushing (7, 8); adjusting means (13) are envisaged on the first element (11) to vary the position of the first element (11) relative to the second element (12) when an external force is applied to the hinge body (1, 2), properly installed and in use, to turn it between two or more stable positions defined by grooves (1s, 2s) made in the axial hole (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0054 (2013.01); E05D 5/14 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0794307 A1 19970910; EP 0794307 B1 20000726; AT 195016 T 20000815; DE 69702628 D1 20000831; DE 69702628 T2 20010412; ES 1035167 U 19970316; ES 1035167 Y 19970801; ES 2150750 T3 20001201; IT 1285585 B1 19980618; IT BO960107 A1 19970904; IT BO960107 D0 19960304

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060301

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-06-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-06-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150750 T3

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702628 20000831

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

2000-07-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195016 T 20000815

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971103

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT