Global Patent Index - EP 0794383 B1

EP 0794383 B1 2002-11-06 - Method of operating a pressurised atomising nozzle

Title (en)

Method of operating a pressurised atomising nozzle

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Druckzerstäuberdüse

Title (fr)

Méthode d'exploitation d'une buse de pulvérisation par pression

Publication

EP 0794383 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810083 A

Priority

DE 19608349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0794383A2] The swirl chamber (39) is connected with an outer chamber by a nozzle hole (33) and has at least one inflow duct (41) for the liquid being atomised. The liquid is conveyed under pressure through the first inflow duct. The chamber contains at least one further inflow duct (38) for part of the liquid (37) being atomised or for a second liquid being atomised. Either or both liquids is/are conveyed under pressure and while swirling through the second inflow duct. The nozzle hole is in the cover (32) of a first pipe in which a smaller diameter second pipe (35) fits. The annular gap (36) between the pipes acts an inflow for a swirl stage. The second pipe is bounded by a filler piece (40)containing at least one tangential swirl duct. At least one inflow duct (41) acts as turbulence duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/26; F23C 7/00; F23D 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/34 (2006.01); B05B 7/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/10 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/26 (2006.01); F23D 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/3478 (2013.01); B05B 1/3442 (2013.01); B05B 7/0408 (2013.01); B05B 7/10 (2013.01); F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 11/26 (2013.01); F23D 11/383 (2013.01); B05B 1/3447 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0794383 A2 19970910; EP 0794383 A3 19980401; EP 0794383 B1 20021106; CN 1164442 A 19971112; DE 19608349 A1 19970911; JP H09327641 A 19971222; US 5934555 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170219

2017-03-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170219

2017-02-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708638

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59708638

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708638

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59708638

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59708638

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708638

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708638

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708638 20021212

2002-11-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-03-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF OPERATING A PRESSURISED ATOMISING NOZZLE

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF OPERATING A PRESSURISED ATOMISING NOZZLE

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000616

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980825

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT