Global Patent Index - EP 0794686 A3

EP 0794686 A3 2002-09-25 - Microphone with associated amplifier

Title (en)

Microphone with associated amplifier

Title (de)

Mikrofon mit zugeordnetem Verstärker

Title (fr)

Microphone avec amplificateur associé

Publication

EP 0794686 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97250020 A

Priority

DE 19606261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0794686A2] A cable (11) interconnects the digital circuits of the microphone and its associated amplifier, the microphone digital circuit comprises a sound converter (1), two pre-amplifiers (V1,2), and two A/D converters (6) for a two-channel digital audio format. The two pre-amplifiers are coupled to the sound converter output and are linked each to one A/D converter, connected to a digital driver stage. The associated amplifier has a receiver and a signal processor, which generates a single-channel signal from the digital two-channel audio format, with the signal used for computing amplifying and filtering for the microphone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/04; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19606261 A1 19970814; DE 19606261 C2 19980409; AT 341920 T 20061015; DK 0794686 T3 20070205; EP 0794686 A2 19970910; EP 0794686 A3 20020925; EP 0794686 B1 20061004; US 6028946 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 341920 T

- Effective date: 20170202

2017-02-06 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170202

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070525

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-05 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FR GB LI

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FR GB LI

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FR GB LI