Global Patent Index - EP 0794711 B1

EP 0794711 B1 2000-12-06 - PROTECTIVE GARMENT WITH CLOSED-CELL FOAM LINER

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE GARMENT WITH CLOSED-CELL FOAM LINER

Title (de)

SCHUTZBEKLEIDUNG MIT GESCHLOSSENZELLIGER SCHAUMINNENSCHICHT

Title (fr)

VETEMENT PROTECTEUR A DOUBLURE EN MOUSSE A ALVEOLES FERMEES

Publication

EP 0794711 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94928577 A

Priority

US 9410272 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9608174A1] A protective garment (10) having an outer shell (26) and an inner liner (28) functioning as a thermal barrier and moisture barrier made of a fire-retardant, apertured or non-apertured closed-cell foam material (29). The closed-cell foam liner (28) is moisture resistant and at the same time provides adequate thermal insulation. In a first embodiment, the moisture resistance of the foam liner (28) eliminates the need for a separate moisture barrier, and allows the liner (28) to be bonded directly to the outer shell (26). However, in a preferred embodiment, the inner liner (28) is separate from the shell (26) and includes a fabric substrate (66) of an aramid fiber to which it is bonded. The fabric substrate faces the wearer and prevents abrasion of the foam (29) by the wearer and enhances the tear strength of the foam (29). In an second preferred embodiment, the garment includes a moisture barrier layer (64) positioned between the foam liner (28) and the wearer of the garment (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00; A62B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A62B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/0027 (2013.01); A62B 17/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9608174 A1 19960321; AU 8134194 A 19960329; CA 2154182 A1 19960314; CA 2154182 C 20010123; DE 69426397 D1 20010111; DE 69426397 T2 20010719; EP 0794711 A1 19970917; EP 0794711 A4 19981216; EP 0794711 B1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100913

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69426397

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100913

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426397

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-12-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19981029

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970319

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB