Global Patent Index - EP 0794855 B1

EP 0794855 B1 2000-06-14 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF SURFACES

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF SURFACES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES

Publication

EP 0794855 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95940241 A

Priority

  • DE 4442397 A
  • EP 9504642 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19543901A1] In a process for treatment of a surface, esp. a narrow surface, a mouldable coating material is applied to the surface(3) and then smoothed and/or impressed with a moving belt(11). Claimed process equipment includes a transfer unit for applying the coating and a coating smoothing unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/00 (2006.01); B05C 1/14 (2006.01); B05D 1/28 (2006.01); B05D 1/40 (2006.01); B05D 3/12 (2006.01); B05D 7/02 (2006.01); B05D 7/26 (2006.01); B27D 5/00 (2006.01); B27N 3/24 (2006.01); B27N 7/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); C09D 123/02 (2006.01); C09D 123/08 (2006.01); C09D 167/00 (2006.01); C09D 175/04 (2006.01); C09D 177/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/12 (2013.01); B05C 1/006 (2013.01); B05C 1/14 (2013.01); B05D 1/40 (2013.01); B27D 5/003 (2013.01); B27N 7/005 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31591 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31783 (2015.04); Y10T 428/3179 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19543901 A1 19960530; AT 193856 T 20000615; CA 2206419 A1 19960606; DK 0794855 T3 20001106; EP 0794855 A1 19970917; EP 0794855 B1 20000614; FI 972260 A0 19970528; FI 972260 A 19970528; US 6180172 B1 20010130; WO 9616777 A1 19960606

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051124

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-07-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-11-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193856

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971211

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970520

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT NL