Global Patent Index - EP 0794910 B1

EP 0794910 B1 2000-01-19 - VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR A PRESSURISED LIQUID OR FOAM DISPENSER

Title (en)

VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR A PRESSURISED LIQUID OR FOAM DISPENSER

Title (de)

VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER ZUR ABGABE VON UNTER DRUCK STEHENDER FLÜSSIGKEIT ODER SCHAUM

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE SOUPAPE POUR RECIPIENTS DISTRIBUTEURS DE LIQUIDES OU DE MOUSSES SOUS PRESSION

Publication

EP 0794910 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95935344 A

Priority

  • DE 9501460 W
  • DE 4443287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4443287A1] A valve arrangement is disclosed for dispensers of pressurised liquids or foams, in particular polyurethane foam, mounting or sealing foam. The top side of the dispenser has a valve disk (13) with an in particular round opening in which a valve body (1) provided with a valve stem (4) is secured. The valve stem (4) may be pressed against the force of a spring and co-operates with sealing elements to open the valve. The sealing elements have a sealing body with in particular plane or conical sealing surfaces that lie on plane or conical sealing surfaces of the valve body (1) in the closed position of the valve. The valve body (1) is a plastic composite body that consists of a hard inner part (2) and a soft outer part (3). The hard inner part (2) and the soft outer part (3) are intimately joined at their common contact surfaces into a non-detachable composite material by an injection moulding process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4443287 A1 19960613; DE 4443287 C2 20010809; AT 188940 T 20000215; EP 0794910 A1 19970917; EP 0794910 B1 20000119; US 5927563 A 19990727; WO 9617795 A1 19960613

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-07-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507658 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188940 T 20000215

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971013

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI