Global Patent Index - EP 0794997 A4

EP 0794997 A4 2000-03-08 - CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSMITTEL ZÜR KÖRPERPFLEGE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DEMAQUILLANTES

Publication

EP 0794997 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95942543 A

Priority

  • GB 9424476 A
  • US 9515722 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9617916A1] A liquid personal cleansing composition comprising: a) from about 5 % to about 60 % by weight of water-soluble surfactant selected from anionic, nonionic and amphoteric surfactants and mixtures thereof; b) from about 0.01 % to about 10 % by weight of a hydrophobically modified nonionic cellulose ether selected from C10-C24 alkyl and alkenyl modified methyl, hydroxyethyl and hydroxypropyl cellulose ethers having a degree of nonionic substitution in the range of from about 1.8 to about 4 and a degree of hydrophobic substitution in the range of from about 0.1 % to about 1 % by weight; c) from about 0 % to about 10 % by weight of a water-soluble polyol; d) from about 0.01 % to about 5 % by weight of cationic polymeric skin conditioning agent; and e) water; and wherein the composition displays a shear stress of about 150Pa at a shear rate in the range from about 100s<-1> to about 600s<-1> at 25 DEG C. The products demonstrate excellent in-use efficacy benefits including mildness, a moisturised skin feel, desirable rheology and application characteristics, good rinsibility and good product stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/38; A61K 7/06; A61K 7/48; A61K 7/50; C11D 1/66; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/39 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01); C11D 1/38 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3742 (2013.01); A61K 8/345 (2013.01); A61K 8/39 (2013.01); A61K 8/44 (2013.01); A61K 8/463 (2013.01); A61K 8/73 (2013.01); A61K 8/731 (2013.01); A61K 8/8182 (2013.01); A61K 8/86 (2013.01); A61K 8/922 (2013.01); A61Q 5/02 (2013.01); A61Q 19/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/2065 (2013.01); C11D 3/225 (2013.01); C11D 3/227 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3773 (2013.01); A61K 2800/5422 (2013.01); A61K 2800/5426 (2013.01); A61K 2800/594 (2013.01); C11D 3/2044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4243802 A 19810106 - LANDOLL LEO M
  • [E] WO 9617591 A1 19960613 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]
  • [Y] US 5120532 A 19920609 - WELLS ROBERT L [US], et al
  • [Y] BRUIN DE J J: "HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED CELLULOSE ETHER FOR PERSONAL CARE", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE,DE,VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, H. ZIOLKOWSKY K.G. AUGSBURG, vol. 120, no. 15, pages 944-946,948, XP000483287, ISSN: 0942-7694
  • See also references of WO 9617916A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9617916 A1 19960613; BR 9509947 A 19980127; CN 1080557 C 20020313; CN 1174565 A 19980225; EG 20929 A 20000628; EP 0794997 A1 19970917; EP 0794997 A4 20000308; GB 9424476 D0 19950118; JP H10509991 A 19980929; MX 9704085 A 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2000-03-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11D 1/38 A, 7C 11D 1/66 B, 7C 11D 3/22 B, 7C 11D 3/37 B, 7A 61K 7/06 B, 7A 61K 7/48 B, 7A 61K 7/50 B

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970603

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE