Global Patent Index - EP 0795076 B1

EP 0795076 B1 2001-03-21 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A FUEL METERING SYSTEM

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A FUEL METERING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES KRAFTSTOFFZUMESSSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER UN SYSTEME DE DOSAGE DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0795076 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96913440 A

Priority

  • DE 9600737 W
  • DE 19536111 A
  • DE 19548279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5945596A] PCT No. PCT/DE96/00737 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 21, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 21, 1997 PCT Filed Apr. 27, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/12136 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 3, 1996A method and a device for monitoring a fuel-metering system, in particular a common-rail system for a diesel fuel engine. A defect is recognized on the basis of an output signal from a structure-borne noise sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/14; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/221 (2013.01); F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1432 (2013.01); F02D 2041/224 (2013.01); F02D 2041/226 (2013.01); F02D 2200/025 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5945596 A 19990831; EP 0795076 A1 19970917; EP 0795076 B1 20010321; JP H10510028 A 19980929; WO 9712136 A1 19970403

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110428

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110427

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110427

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110427

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606636 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990319

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971006

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE